HI HB316 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB316
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, as a prerequisite for a vehicle to be deemed derelict, that the removal of a part must render the vehicle inoperable. Includes vehicles valued at less than $1,000 in the list of derelict vehicles that may be removed by a county or Hawaii Public Housing Authority. Effective 1/28/2081. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Derelict Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 3:15PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-19 3:03PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-18-19 3:41PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-17-19 4:35PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Kim, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Matayoshi, San Buenaventura, Thielen. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 638). |
2019-04-05 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 654) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1738) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 366). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 947) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Say, Yamane, Thielen. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-04-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB316 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 325.