HI HB318 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Act 229, 7/12/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Act 229, 7/12/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a interagency task force on vog to discuss the impact of vog on the people of Hawaii and find ways to address these issues. (SD2)
Title
Health; Civil Defense; Agriculture; Vog
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (S) Act 229, 7/12/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333). | |
2011-07-12 | (H) Act 229, on 7/12/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333). | |
2011-06-27 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-27-11 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-06-27 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1268) | |
2011-05-06 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 699). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 695). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Herkes, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tsuji. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 2:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 2:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-11 2:30PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Aquino, Cullen Co-Chairs; Herkes, Tsuji, Fontaine. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 449) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1158) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 813) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 83). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 803) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Coffman. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-11 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 199) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 02-03-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to PBM, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |