HI HB32 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 190, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 190, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline for the Legislative Reference Bureau to submit the sunrise analysis required by Act 109, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, from 9/1/2019, to 11/13/2019. (HB32 CD1)
Title
Relating To Family Leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 190, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 190, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1292). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 176). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 176) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-19 2:45PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-19 2:00PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Eli Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 692) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1986) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-19 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1243) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 137). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 982), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 327) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB293 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA, WAM.