HI HB321 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a process for voter registration at absentee polling places. Effective 07/01/50. (SD2)
Title
Absentee Polling Place; Voter Registration
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-13 at 5:00 PM in Conference Room 325. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Gabbard, Ihara, Kouchi. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Ing Co-Chairs; Belatti, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 484) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1362) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1012) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 10:05AM in conference room 16. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 200). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Ichiyama, Kawakami, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Johanson, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-13 at 2:00pm. |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-21-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |