HI HB34 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 191, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 191, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the "public work" definition under Chapter 104, HRS, wages and hours of employees on public works law, to include projects for which funds or resources used are to any extent derived from State or county public revenues, or from the sale of securities or bonds whose interest or dividends are exempt from state or federal taxes. (HB34 CD1)
Title
Relating To Wages.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 191, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 191, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1293). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 182). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 182) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Ihara. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Eli Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 693) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1910) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1509) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 138). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1111), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-29-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1475 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954).