HI HB340 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 055, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1156).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to HTDC for the Small Business Innovation Research Program, Manufacturing Assistance Program, and Excelerator Program. (HB340 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Hawaii Technology Development Corporation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 055, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1156).
2019-06-12HouseAct 055, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1156).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 152).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 152) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 12:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 12:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 12:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; J.Keohokalole, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Matsumoto.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 722) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1980) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from EET/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1518) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on EET/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 3:30PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to EET/TEC, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 164).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1104), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 628) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Johanson, Quinlan.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19.
2019-02-01HouseThis measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-06-19 11:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-06-19 11:00AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-01-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB994 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback