HI HB353 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 198, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 198, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $250,000 in matching funds for each year of the 2013-2015 fiscal biennium for the Department of Agriculture to research and develop methods for the prevention and treatment of coffee berry borer infestations. Appropriates $300,000 in matching funds for the 2013-2014 fiscal year for the Department of Agriculture to fund efforts to control and mitigate the damage from coffee berry borer infestation. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB353 CD1)
Title
Agriculture; Coffee Berry Borer; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 198, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301). |
2013-07-02 | House | Act 198, on 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige. |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 136). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 136) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Ige, Kouchi, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Lowen, Onishi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wooley. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:30PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:15PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:15PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 3:15PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 701). |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Ige, Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | House | House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Wooley. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Lowen, Onishi, Cheape. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 485) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1396) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, L. Thielen. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 865) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 143). |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 599) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-14 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-14-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-11 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |