HI HB360 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB360
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline for the Legislative Reference Bureau to submit the sunrise analysis required by Act 109, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, from 9/1/2019, to 12/13/2019.
Title
Relating To Family Leave.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB360 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB308 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB308 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=360&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB360_.HTM |