HI HB361 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB361
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the governor and each county mayor, while holding those offices, to maintain any other employment or receive any emolument, beginning on the sixty-first calendar day after their election or appointment to office. Specifies that the county boards and commissions have enforcement authority over each respective county mayor. Specifies that the hawaii state ethics commission has enforcement authority over the governor. Effective 7/1/2020. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Emoluments.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1363) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-14-19 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 371). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Say, Tokioka voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD , referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB361 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.