HI HB373 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB373
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that 0.5 per cent, rather than one per cent, of state fund appropriations for capital improvements shall be transferred into the works of art special fund. Limits the 0.5 per cent amount to appropriations designated for the construction of new state buildings, properties, or facilities.
Title
Relating To Works Of Art Special Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB373 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB848 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM.
SB848 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=373&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB373_.HTM |