HI HB378 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Transportation to hire and award security contracts by negotiation and not through a bid. Effective 07/01/2050. (HB378 HD1)
Title
Procurement; Security Contracts; Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to TIA, JGO/WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 109). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Belatti, Berg, Brower, Finnegan, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Marumoto, Morita, Pine, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen, Wakai, Ward voting no (14) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Takai excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 936), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Choy, Har, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Brower, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Nishimoto. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-05-09 2:30 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Takai, Takumi excused (3). | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 289) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, M. Lee, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Saiki; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2009-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-09-09 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |