HI HB383 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB383
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes or merges with an existing task force a Child Welfare Services Task Force to review the Child Welfare Services Branch and examine best practices that will help to improve child care safety through the Branch. (HB383 HD1)
Title
Relating To Child Welfare Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 670) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1022 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB383 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
HB383 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).