HI HB389 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - (H) Act 210, on 7/8/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - (H) Act 210, on 7/8/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Heeia community development district in Koolaupoko, Oahu. (SD2)
Title
Land Use; Heeia Community Development District
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | (H) Act 210, on 7/8/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314). | |
2011-07-11 | (S) Act 210, 7/8/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314). | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 664). | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Ching, Tsuji excused (3). | |
2011-04-20 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 659). | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 4-14-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Dela Cruz, Chair; Solomon, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 657). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Chang, Hanohano, Har (Co-)Chairman; Ito, Riviere. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Chang, Hanohano, Har Co-Chairs; Ito, Riviere. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 458) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1182) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 951) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee on WLH has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-22-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH will hold a public decision making on 03-22-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 03-22-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 97). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 834) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Tokioka. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-11 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from WLO/HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 514) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Jordan, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Pine. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Chong, Morita. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO/HAW on Wednesday, 02-16-11 10:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Re-referred to WLO/HAW, FIN, referral sheet 15 | |
2011-02-09 | (H) HD 1 adopted and recommitted to WLO for further consideration with none voting no and Representative(s) Ito excused. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Recommends recommittal to WLO. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 159) as amended in HD 1. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Carroll, Chong, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Morita, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-07-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to WLO, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |