HI HB390 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 201, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 201, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent Act 172, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, which: (1) grants employees the right to have a chaperone present during a medical examination relating to a workers' compensation work injury and, with the approval of the examining physician or surgeon, to record the examination; and (2) provides that if an employee or employee's chaperone obstructs the medical examination, the employee's right to worker's compensation shall be suspended until the refusal or obstruction ceases. Effective 6/29/2019. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 201, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 201, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 880). |
2019-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 866). |
2019-04-24 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Baker, K. Rhoads Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Eli Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 725) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1907) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from LCA/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1512) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-20-19 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to LCA/CPH, JDC. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 170). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 984), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 330) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-07-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |