HI HB393 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 230, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 230, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Waives DOH water quality certification requirement for restoration, repair, and operation of Hawaiian loko ia (fishponds) that are permitted under the Statewide Programmatic General Permit process, administered by the DLNR. (SD2)
Title
Loko ia; Hawaiian Fishponds; Waiver; Water Quality Certification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Act 230, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339). |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Act 230, 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339). |
2015-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 655). |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-05-01 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 651). |
2015-04-30 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-15. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 640). |
2015-04-27 | House | House Conferees Discharged: Representatives Ing, Belatti, Keohokalole discharged as Co-Chairs. Representatives Lowen, Pouha discharged as Conferees. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Green, L. Thielen, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ing, Belatti, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Lowen, Pouha. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 468). |
2015-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 494) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-15. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1365) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 9:35AM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from HWN/HTH/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1076) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Riviere, Slom. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere, Slom. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Slom. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HTH/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-15 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HWN/HTH/WTL, JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 180). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 794) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 423), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-18-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-04-15 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to OMH, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |