HI HB396 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on EEP/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a Coastal Erosion Proactive Adaptation Plan Task Force, to be assisted by an Advisory Group, to develop a Coastal Erosion Proactive Adaptation Plan for streamlined and proactive shoreline permitting procedures that better mitigate impacts to Hawaii's coastal zone and lower the costs to public and private permit applicants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Coastal Erosion Proactive Adaptation Plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on EEP/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 8:55AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB828 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback