HI HB398 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Act 172, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the composition of the Board of Regents of the University of Hawaii and reduces the number of board members from 15 members to 11 members. Specifies terms of holdover board members. (HB398 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The University Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateAct 172, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274).
2019-07-03HouseAct 172, on 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1274).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Say voting no (2) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 198).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 198) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Cullen, Hashimoto, D. Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-19 11:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-25SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 865).
2019-04-24HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto.
2019-04-23SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 851).
2019-04-23HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 2:05PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Kidani, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 805).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 887) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-11SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) S. Chang). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-19.
2019-04-09SenateReport filed.
2019-04-09SenateSeparated Committee Report.
2019-04-09SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateFloor Amendment No.16 offered.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2040) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1355) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to HRE, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 171).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1094), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-07HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 134) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tokioka.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback