HI HB4 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB4
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes completion of a voter registration application affidavit a mandatory part of all driver's license and identification card applications. Automatically registers each applicant for voting unless the applicant affirmatively declines to register. Requires sharing of information among the counties, Department of Transportation, and election personnel.
Title
Relating To Voter Registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB215 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TRS/JDC, WAM.
SB638 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Act 015, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
SB215 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TRS/JDC, WAM.
SB638 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Act 015, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=4&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB4_.HTM |