HI HB40 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB40
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes health care providers, non-profit organizations, businesses, and faith-based organizations to distribute supplemental nutrition assistance program applications to prospective applicants. (HB40 HD1)
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 471) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Ward. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-13-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB40 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).