HI HB402 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB402
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 868).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 868).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all grants and contracts awarded by the Office of Hawaiian Affairs shall be subject to be individually approved by the board of trustees. Reduces the University of Hawaii's portion of receipts from the use, sale, lease, or other disposition of lands within the public land trust to be collected during each fiscal year to the amount equal to the University of Hawaii's receipts derived from tuition and special funds utilized for Native Hawaiian programs. Establishes a public land trust revenues negotiating committee to determine the increase to the annual amount of the income and proceeds from the public land trust that the Office of Hawaiian Affairs shall receive annually under the state constitution and other state law. Requires the Department of Budget and Finance to conduct a financial review of the amounts of revenue generated from the public land trust. Requires the Auditor to report to the Legislature on a comprehensive review of programs administered by the State that serve Hawaiians. Appropriates funds. Prohibits any increases proposed by the public land trust revenues negotiating committee that are not already approved for use by or appropriated to the Office of Hawaiian Affairs until the fiscal and comprehensive reviews required by this measure are completed and submitted to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Increasing The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs' Pro Rata Share Of Public Land Trust Funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 868). |
2019-04-25 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Luke Co-Chairs; Holt, Thielen. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; English, Kim Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 728) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2049) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has rescheduled its public hearing to 04-05-19 5:00PM in conference room 211. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-19 12:30PM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HWN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1470) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/HRE, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 374). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1251), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 607) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-01-31 | House | Re-referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2019-01-30 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 01-30-19 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB402 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 868).
SB1363 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
SB1363 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.