HI HB405 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-22 - Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-22 - Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits family courts from awarding a person custody of or visitation with a child if the person has been convicted of rape or sexual assault and the child was conceived as a result of that violation. Authorizes the family courts to terminate parental rights, with respect to a child, of a natural father who has been convicted of rape or sexual assault and the child was conceived as a result of the rape or sexual assault.
Title
Parental Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB529 (Same As) 2013-07-09 - Act 253, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1356).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=405&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB405_.HTM |