HI HB420 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Act 171, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1273).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Act 171, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1273).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes a provision from the Transient Accommodations Tax law designating the Hawaii Convention Center as the location for operation of a Hawaiian Center and the Museum of Hawaiian Music and Dance. (HB420 CD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Culture.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Val Okimoto [R] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | Act 171, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1273). |
2019-07-03 | House | Act 171, on 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1273). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 49). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 49) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Wakai, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Yamane, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-19 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-19 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Wakai, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Yamane, Holt Co-Chairs; Cabanilla Arakawa, Okimoto. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 731) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2047) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HWN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1447) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HWN/EET, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 378). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1236) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from TIA/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 511), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cachola, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA/WLH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:30AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB803 (Same As) 2019-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.