HI HB424 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 277, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1383).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the governor to appoint commissioners of deeds to administer oaths, take acknowledgements, and take proofs of execution outside of the United States in connection with the execution of conveyance documents relating to a time share interest, any property subject to a time share plan, or the operation of a time share plan covering any property located within the State. Requires written notice to be provided to consumers. Establishes bonding requirements, penalties, and liabilities for commissioners of deeds. Makes appropriations. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB424 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Time Shares; Conveyances; Commissioners of Deeds; Appropriation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 277, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1383).
2013-07-09HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 277, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1383).
2013-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-13(Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-05-07HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige.
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 114).
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 114) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nishimoto, Evans; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2013-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 016.
2013-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 12:45PM in conference room 016.
2013-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2013-04-22HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 2:30PM in conference room 016.
2013-04-18HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
2013-04-18HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 4:00PM in conference room 016.
2013-04-18SenateSenator(s) Espero replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s).
2013-04-17HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Evans, McDermott.
2013-04-05SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
2013-04-04HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-03HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 427) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-04-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-03-13.
2013-04-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1118) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, L. Thielen.
2013-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-03-15SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 863) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi, Wakai.
2013-03-07SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-13 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2013-03-05SenateReferred to CPN, WAM.
2013-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 88).
2013-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 670), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
2013-02-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2013-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).
2013-02-13HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 359) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-02-04HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Har.
2013-01-31HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-13 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2013-01-30HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-13.
2013-01-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 01-30-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2013-01-22HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB914 (Same As) 2013-04-03 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback