HI HB434 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on HLT/PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on HLT/PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Alcohol and Drug Abuse Division Special Fund (Special Fund) within the Department of Health. Reclassifies specific low-level marijuana offenses as non-criminal violations subject to a fine, which shall be deposited into the Special Fund for public education and awareness programs aimed at reducing the use of harmful drugs.
Title
Relating To Marijuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/PVM on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT/PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB434 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on HLT/PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=434&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB434_.HTM |