HI HB437 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 237, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes crime victim compensation for mental health services for survivors in cases involving a death and for children who witness domestic violence. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Crime Victim Compensation For Mental Health Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 237, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339).
2019-07-09HouseAct 237, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1339).
2019-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 887).
2019-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-05-02HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 886).
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 881).
2019-04-30HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
2019-04-30HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, Gates Co-Chairs; Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 732) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1983) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1288) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 379).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1207) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
2019-02-13HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 342), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-04HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Thielen.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-01HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB607 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback