HI HB444 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 652).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 652).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the same rights, benefits, protections, and responsibilities of spouses in a marriage to partners in a civil union. (SD1)
Title
Civil Unions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 652). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 414). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-30 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 638). | |
2010-04-29 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Chang, Ching, Choy, Evans, Finnegan, Har, Ito, Magaoay, Manahan, Mizuno, Pine, Sagum, Souki, Takai, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward, Yamane voting no (20) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-29 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2010-04-29 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 1-29-10 | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Postponed Indefinitely with 49; 1 No(es) Representative(s) Bertram; and 1 Excused Representative(s) Herkes. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 5) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 18; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 7 (Senator(s) Bunda, Espero, Gabbard, Hemmings, Kim, Sakamoto, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Floor amendment failed following Roll Call vote: Ayes, 10. Noes, 15 (Senator(s) Bunda, Espero, Gabbard, Hanabusa, Hee, Hemmings, Kim, Kokubun, Nishihara, Sakamoto, Slom, Takamine, Taniguchi, Tokuda, Tsutsui). Excused, 0 (none). | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Floor Amendment No. 1 offered. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) One Day Notice 1/22/2010. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 19. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero. Noes, 5 (Senator(s) Bunda, Gabbard, Hemmings, Sakamoto, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kim). | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 1). Roll call Vote: Ayes, 16. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Bunda, Espero, Gabbard, Kim, Sakamoto. Noes, 9 (Senator(s) Baker, English, Fukunaga, Green, Hee, Hooser, Ige, Ihara, Kidani) Excused, 0 (none) | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Floor Amendment No. 20 offered. | |
2009-05-07 | (S) Recalled from JGO; carried by Roll call Vote: Ayes, 10. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Galuteria, Nishihara. Noes, 15 (Senator(s) Bunda, Espero, Gabbard, Green, Hanabusa, Hee, Hemmings, Kim, Kokubun, Sakamoto, Slom, Takamine, Taniguchi, Tokuda, Tsutsui.) Excused, 0 (none). | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Motion to recall from JGO; Failed to carry by Roll call Vote: Ayes, 6. Noes, 18 (Senator(s) Bunda, Espero, Gabbard, Galuteria, Green, Hanabusa, Hee, Hemmings, Ige, Kim, Kokubun, Nishihara, Sakamoto, Slom, Takamine, Taniguchi, Tokuda, Tsutsui). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The recommendation was not adopted. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JGO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Bunda, Gabbard, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-09 9:00am in Capitol Auditorium. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 8). | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Ching, Choy, Evans, Finnegan, Har, Ito, Magaoay, Manahan, McKelvey, Mizuno, Pine, Sagum, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting no (17) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Ching, Choy, Finnegan, Har, Manahan, McKelvey, Sagum, Tokioka, Ward voting no (10) and Representative(s) Awana, Mizuno, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-02-10 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 157) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Herkes, Luke, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wakai. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-05-09 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |