HI HB453 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes from the definition of "public utility", persons who install renewable energy systems on their property and provide, sell, or transmit the power therefrom to an electric utility or lessee/tenant of the property. (HB453 HD1)
Title
Renewable Energy; Landlords; Lessors; Public Utility
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-25-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 450) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-02-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-12-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |