HI HB456 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB456

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires police departments to disclose to the Legislature the identity of an officer upon the officer's second suspension in a five-year period or discharge. Requires disclosure under the Uniform Information Practices Act after a police officer's second suspension in a five-year period. (HB456 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17SenateRe-Referred to PSM, JDC.
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
2017-03-22SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 961) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
2017-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to PSM, JDL.
2017-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 259).
2017-03-07HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-02HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2017-03-02HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-02-24HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-24-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2017-02-15HouseRe-referred to JUD, referral sheet 20
2017-01-23HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 2
2017-01-23HousePass First Reading
2017-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB424 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB456 (Carry Over) 2017-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback