HI HB465 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to exercise enforcement powers against an employer in a covered establishment that would require the employer to adhere to, and comply with, the notification and penalty provisions of section 394B-9, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (HB465 HD1)
Title
Dislocated Workers; Enforcement Powers; Employer
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Reported from LAB/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 148) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Re-referred to LAB/ERB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8 | |
2011-02-01 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/ERB on Tuesday, 02-01-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to LAB/ERB, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |