HI HB469 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health insurance policies and contracts issued after 12/31/19 to provide coverage for the cost of hearing aids at a minimum of $1,500 per hearing aid for each hearing-impaired ear every thirty-six months in their base plans. Exempts mandatory health care coverage from impact assessment report. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Hearing Aids.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
2019-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719).
2019-04-09HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-05HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 671) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1777) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 187).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 514), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 178) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:45AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1027 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback