HI HB471 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 207, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1321).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 207, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1321).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the legislature from appropriating from the Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund: (1) more than 50% of the balance of the fund in a single fiscal year; (2) to expend for discretionary costs in a fiscal year, an amount that exceeds 10% of the total discretionary funds appropriated by the Legislature for the same fiscal year; and (3) for a succeeding fiscal year, unless the current fiscal year's tax collection is less than the collection for the previous fiscal year. (HB471 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Emergency And Budget Reserve Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 207, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1321). |
2017-07-13 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 207, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1321). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Oshiro voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 118). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 118) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cachola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; English, Riviere. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cachola, Tupola. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 572) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1462) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-28-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 263). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |