HI HB471 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 125, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes quorum requirements for the Policy Advisory Board for Elder Affairs. (HB471 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Aging.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateAct 125, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
2019-06-28HouseAct 125, on 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 38).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 38) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-24SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-24HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, C. Lee; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 10:45AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Ruderman Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 740) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenateReported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1879) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH/HMS.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 50).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-22HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5).
2019-02-13HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 368) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Mizuno, Say.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-06-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1029 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback