HI HB475 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 211, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1325).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 211, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1325).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the use of personal closed captioning systems as an alternative means of ensuring that closed captioning is provided by movie theatres with at least two locations. Extends the sunset date of the law that requires closed captioning at such movie theatres and requires a study of the impact of that law. (HB475 CD1)
Title
Relating To Movie Theatres.
Sponsors
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 211, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1325). |
2017-07-13 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 211, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1325). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 187). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 187) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 3:30PM in Conference Room 309. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 12:55PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:30PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 1:30PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:30PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Baker, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Ward. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584). |
2017-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 520) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-07-17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1343) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-29-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/JDL. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 969) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/JDL. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to ETT, CPH/JDL. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to ETT, CPH. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 97). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 893), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Lowen, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 641) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2017-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-15-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1156 (Same As) 2017-03-17 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.