HI HB476 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 4:40PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits advertising of public housing units and housing subject to an owner or renter occupancy requirement under chapters 201H, 206E, and 356D, Hawaii Revised Statutes, for rental purposes and requires county police departments to enforce the prohibition. Does not apply to any state agency advertising or publicizing a housing program under chapters 201H, 206E, and 356D, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and any county agency for a housing program under chapter 201H, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 4:40PM in Conference Room 423.
2019-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 4:00PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:32PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 1:10PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 1:10PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: S. Chang Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Brower, San Buenaventura, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 741) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1975) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1443) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on HOU added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee on HOU has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-19-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-19-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to HOU, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 189).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from HSG/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 526) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Say.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HSH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HSG/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback