HI HB483 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Act 177, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Act 177, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Effective 1/1/2020, incorporates federal law regarding social groups and youth services organizations, same-sex living facilities, and sex-restricted scholarships and other forms of financial assistance into Act 110, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018. Extends the deadline for the legislative reference bureau to complete the study requested by Act 110 on existing federal Title IX enforcement practices and procedures on the federal level and in other jurisdictions. Requires the legislative reference bureau to make a report to the legislature no later than 8/1/2019. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Civil Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-05 | Senate | Act 177, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279). |
2019-07-05 | House | Act 177, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 880). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 876). |
2019-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825). |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Cullen, C. Lee, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 743) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1870) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1464) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 381). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 616) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 160) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Belatti. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1042 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.