HI HB507 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 117, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 117, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a judge or magistrate to approve a search warrant based on sworn oral statements or electronic communications. Effective 1/1/2020. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Search Warrants.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Act 117, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219). |
2019-06-25 | House | Act 117, on 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1219). |
2019-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 871). |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-04-25 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 861). |
2019-04-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-09-19. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 857). |
2019-04-23 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Kim, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, Thielen. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719). |
2019-04-09 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 672) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1785) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 388). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 951) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, Thielen. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB179 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.