HI HB508 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB508
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons arrested for felony sexual offenses to provide a DNA sample. Defines felony sexual offenses. Provides for the destruction of DNA samples and expungement of a DNA database profile when appropriate. Makes an appropriation for the costs of DNA collection and expungement. (HB508 HD1)
Title
Relating To Dna Collection For Certain Felony Offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 191). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 964), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 585) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Say; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Morikawa. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB508 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
SB180 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
SB180 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC, WAM.