HI HB510 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 038, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for the Judiciary for the fiscal biennium beginning 7/1/2019 and ending 6/30/2021. Effective 7/1/2019. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Judiciary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 038, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).
2019-06-12HouseAct 038, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Say, Tokioka voting no (5) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 124).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 124) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Dela Cruz, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Luke, Cullen, Yamashita, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 3:20PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:21PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 10:00AM in conference room 325.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 806).
2019-04-12HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Yamashita, Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 748) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1868) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1426) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 389).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1273) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 767) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 02-14-19.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB186 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to JDC, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback