HI HB529 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 212, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 212, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all operators of adult foster homes, assisted living facilities, expanded adult residential care homes, community care foster family homes, and developmental disabilities domiciliary homes to hold a sufficient amount of liability insurance and automobile liability insurance. Permits the director of health to waive the two adult limit for certification of a home as an adult foster home; provided that the number of adults with developmental or intellectual disabilities in the certified home shall not exceed three adults with developmental or intellectual disabilities. (SD2)
Title
Care Home Operators; Liability Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 212, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315). |
2013-07-02 | House | Act 212, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 757). |
2013-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Cachola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, McDermott. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 12:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Green, Kidani, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Carroll, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, Cachola, McDermott. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 500) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1263) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Wakai, Slom. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 999) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HMS, CPN. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 840), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13. |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 202) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Cabanilla, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 01-31-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HUS, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |