HI HB529 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 204, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 204, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any vehicle, except a low-range, four-wheel drive vehicle, from being driven through or in Waipio Valley, except under certain circumstances. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 204, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 204, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 880). |
2019-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, C. Lee, Hashimoto, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; English, Shimabukuro, Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Luke discharged as Co-Chair. Representative Hashimoto discharged as Member; Added as Co-Chair. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 749) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1918) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1432) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 03-20-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 192). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane. |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 293) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |