HI HB530 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Act 050, 4/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Act 050, 4/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November as homelessness awareness month.
Title
Homelessness Awareness Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | Act 050, 4/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150). |
2013-04-26 | House | Act 050, on 4/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150). |
2013-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 457). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from HMS/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1289) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-13 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to HMS/TEC. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 7). |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Ohno, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 17), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-01-28 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 01-28-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |