HI HB540 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1327).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends sunset provisions with respect to accounting and fiscal management requirements relating to the University of Hawaii. Makes conforming amendments. (HB540 CD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Accounting; Fiscal Management
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Rep. Andria Tupola [R] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/13/2015 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1327). |
2015-07-13 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1327). |
2015-06-29 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1243) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/29/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1243) |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 147). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 147) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Yamashita, Ichiyama, Kong, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Slom. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-15 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Choy added as Co-Chair. Representative Ichiyama discharged as Co-Chair; Added as Member. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Harimoto, Kahele, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Kong, Matsumoto. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 551) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1554) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-15 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1152) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Kahele, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HEA, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 202). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 773), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 415) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2015-02-09 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-10-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |