HI HB541 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 236, 07/14/2015, (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 236, 07/14/2015, (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each UH campus to prepare an operations plan, to be reviewed by the President and VP for Budget and Finance and CFO of UH, for each fiscal year. Requires the moneys in the UH Tuition and Fees Special Fund for each UH campus to lapse to the credit of Program ID No. UOH900 (University of Hawaii, system wide support). (HB541 CD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Special Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Andria Tupola [R] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 236, 07/14/2015, (Gov. Msg. No. 1345). |
2015-07-15 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 236, 07/14/2015, (Gov. Msg. No. 1345). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 146). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 146) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-15 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Choy added as Co-Chair. Representative Ichiyama discharged as Co-Chair; Added as Member. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Aquino, Tupola. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 552) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Kidani). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1509) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-15 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1135) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Kahele, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HEA, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 203). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 770), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 418) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2015-02-09 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-10-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |