HI HB546 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 268, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1371).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund (EUTF) task force to examine the unfunded liability of the EUTF. Requires the EUTF to establish a separate trust fund for public employer contributions with separate accounts for each public employer. Requires the annual public employer contribution to be equal to the amount determined by an actuary commencing with FY 2018-2019. Requires the use of a portion of the general excise tax revenues to supplement deficient state public employer contribution amounts commencing with FY 2018-2019. Requires the use of a portion of the transient accommodations tax revenues to supplement deficient county public employer contribution amounts commencing with FY 2018-2019. Establishes a schedule to phase-in the annual required state public employer contribution requirement. Requires the director of finance to report to the legislature on an implementation plan to have both the EUTF and the ERS jointly sharing investment information and services for the benefit of the trust fund and to establish disbursement channels for county public employer contributions into the trust fund. Makes appropriations. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Task Force; Annual Required Contribution; OPEB ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateAct 268, 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1371).
2013-07-09HouseAct 268, on 7/3/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1371).
2013-05-07HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige.
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 144).
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 144) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Ige, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Cachola, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-13 10:35AM in conference room 325.
2013-04-25SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 742).
2013-04-25HouseHouse conferees appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Cachola, Johanson.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Slom.
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 502) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1380) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-13 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-27SenateThe committee on WAM deferred the measure.
2013-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:10AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-03-21SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 964) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2013-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to JDL, WAM.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 237).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
2013-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 859) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-02-17HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
2013-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
2013-02-12HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 318) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-02-05HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Yamane, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
2013-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3
2013-01-22HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-18HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback