HI HB546 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 115, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 115, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a class 18 small craft producer pub licensee to manufacture not more than 70,000 barrels of malt beverages on the licensee's premises during the license year. Clarifies that a class 14 brewpub licensee or class 18 small craft producer pub licensee may conduct certain activities at satellite locations other than the licensee's primary manufacturing premises under certain conditions. Clarifies the definition of "growler". (HB546 CD1)
Title
Relating To Intoxicating Liquor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Senate | Act 115, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217). |
2019-06-25 | House | Act 115, on 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 151). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 151) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Nishimoto, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 864). |
2019-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday 04-26-19 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 754) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1877) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 194). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1108), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 478) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 235) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19 10:00AM. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 01-30-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB773 (Same As) 2019-03-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
Subjects
Brewpubs
Containers
Intoxicating Liquors
Liquor Licenses
Manufacturers
Retail Sales
Satellite Locations
Small Craft Producer Pubs
Containers
Intoxicating Liquors
Liquor Licenses
Manufacturers
Retail Sales
Satellite Locations
Small Craft Producer Pubs