HI HB551 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Act 170, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends various reporting deadlines and the sunset date of the cesspool conversion working group established pursuant to Act 132, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018. Extends the lapse date on appropriations for the comprehensive statewide study of sewage contamination in nearshore marine areas and for research and technical assistance necessary for completion of the comprehensive cesspool conversion plan. (HB551 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cesspools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateAct 170, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).
2019-07-03HouseAct 170, on 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1272).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 10).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 10) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-22SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim, English, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-22HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-04-18HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-19 11:05AM in conference room 224.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Kim, English Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Tarnas, Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 755) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1920) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from AEN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1389) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 2:15PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-08SenateRe-Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to AEN/CPH/HRE, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 197).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1059), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-07HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-07HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 127), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-31-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback