HI HB56 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-18 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-18 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes rights for domestic workers. Directs DLIR to report on feasibility of allowing domestic workers to organize for the purposes of collective bargaining.
Title
Domestic Workers Bill of Rights; Report
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB535 (Same As) 2013-07-09 - Act 248, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1351).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=56&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB56_.HTM |