HI HB563 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB563
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Say, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Say, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the issuance of covered source air permits for coal-burning electricity generation facilities after 2022. Prohibits the approval of a new, modified, or renewed power purchase agreement for electricity generated from coal. (HB563 HD1)
Title
Relating To A Coal-free Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Say, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen, Tokioka excused (2). |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 8) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Yamane; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB563 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Har, Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Say, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen, Tokioka excused (2).