HI HB571 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB571
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a temporary, refundable tax credit to owners of real property for albizia tree trimming or removal performed under certain conditions. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2019, but shall not be available for taxable years beginning after 12/31/2021.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB571 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=571&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB571_.HTM |