HI HB574 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB574
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the outreach program, rapid re-housing program, housing first program, family assessment centers, law enforcement assisted diversion program, and coordinated statewide homelessness initiative. Establishes and appropriates funds for a short-term rental assistance pilot program and a long-term rental assistance pilot program.
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB574 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4
SB471 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 062, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163).
SB471 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - Act 062, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=574&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB574_.HTM |